U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00248-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Julius
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 21, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • December 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.