U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01130
  • Case Name: Scarpellino et al v. Freeman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • September 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.