U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cv-01534
  • Case Name: Hodge v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 20, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 02, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause - 2255]
  • December 06, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 02, 2022: [Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.