U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00764
  • Case Name: Baltas v. Bowers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.