U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00533
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Caplan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Returning Submission]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.