U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01947
  • Case Name: Ivanisin et al v. Brustolon Buick-GMC, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.