U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01972
  • Case Name: Ramseur v. State of Connecticut Department of Correction
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time]
December, 2024
  • December 13, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.