U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02027
  • Case Name: Manigault v. Greceanu et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set Aside Default]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Entry 55(a)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.