U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01859
  • Case Name: McDonald v. State of Connecticut Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.