U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02030
  • Case Name: Tencza v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [SSA Cases - Standing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.