U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01944
  • Case Name: Hinton et al v. Puzio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: [Clerk's Notice re: Consent Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.