U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02053
  • Case Name: Rolo v. Securities & Exchange Commission et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.