U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01793
  • Case Name: Universal North America Insurance Company v. W.C. Carrera Construction, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Crossclaim]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.