U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01609
  • Case Name: DeAngelis et al v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.