U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02006
  • Case Name: Mezzano v. Loehmann-Blasius Chevrolet, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.