U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01897
  • Case Name: Doe v. Shree Swami, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.