U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Federal Housing Finance Agency et al v. Town of Avon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 15, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.