U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Graciano v. Rubin & Rothman LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 28, 2025: [Clarification]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.