U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00258
  • Case Name: PINDA TECHNOLOGY CO.LTD v. GREENWICH METALS, INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Seal]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.