U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Revere v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.