U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02034
  • Case Name: Blassberg v. Sherpa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • April 21, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 05, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.