U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00836
  • Case Name: Little v. R & L Carriers Shared Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.