U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Charter Communications, Inc. v. Myla
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 10, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 09, 2025: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.