U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01484
  • Case Name: Cieboter v. Connecticut Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Security for Costs]
  • April 04, 2025: [Strike]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.