U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Ratches v. State of Connecticut
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [USM Service Papers Sent - Prisoner]
  • March 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.