U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01246
  • Case Name: Black Widow Termite & Pest Control Corp. v. Black Widow Pest Specialist LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Prejudgment Remedy]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.