U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00772
  • Case Name: Gawlik v. Quiros et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 05, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Copy]
  • April 15, 2025: [Copy]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.