U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Giordano v. Worldwide Flight Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.