U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01687
  • Case Name: L. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.