U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01379
  • Case Name: Ibbison v. Scagliarni et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service - Prisoner]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • March 17, 2025: [USM Service Papers Sent - Prisoner]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • March 12, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.