U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Grant v. World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 04, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 04, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.