U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01585
  • Case Name: Vaughn v. Baron et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.