U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01270
  • Case Name: Raynor v. Trumell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [USM Service Papers Sent - Prisoner]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.