U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01989
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Commissioner]
  • April 21, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.