U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00242
  • Case Name: TJT Capital Group, LLC v. McFadden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.