U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00474
  • Case Name: Pelgrift et al v. CitiMortgage, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.