U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Commercial Funding LLC v. McCullough
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 12, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.