U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01128
  • Case Name: Fountain et al v. Seramonte CT LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • May 07, 2025: [Clarification]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.