U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Pennyman v. Desena et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 28, 2025: [USM Service Papers Sent]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 12, 2025: [USM Service Info to IFP Plaintiff]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.