U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Easy Spirit, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 11, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.