U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00715
  • Case Name: Calhoun v. Quiros et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2025: [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 24, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.