U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01473
  • Case Name: Mohammadi v. Tong et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.