U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00041
  • Case Name: L. v. G6 Hospitality Property LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.