U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01853
  • Case Name: Nevas-Hackmeister v. Connecticut Military Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.