U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01975
  • Case Name: Kendall v. City of New Haven et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 14, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.