U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01830
  • Case Name: Breen v. O'Malley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 03, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Commissioner]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.