U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Walker v. State of Connecticut Judicial Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.