U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01464
  • Case Name: Stone et al v. Woodland Moving & Warehouse, Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.