U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01387
  • Case Name: Belval v. Electric Boat Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 18, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.