U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Fleming v. Town of Salem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.